Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
American Express National Bank v. Michelle Hogan AKA MICHELLE RENEE HOGAN, Element Day Spa & Salon L.L.C.
An Other Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Essex County, NY.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 26, 2021
Last Refreshed
October 12, 2023
Filing Location
Essex County, NY
Category
Other Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Consumer Debt
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
JUDGMENT
Date: Oct 13, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: Oct 12, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: Oct 12, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: Oct 12, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Oct 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - 1
Date: Oct 12, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: Oct 12, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: Oct 12, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jun 17, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 28, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 28, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 28, 2021SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Feb 26, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Feb 26, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
October 13, 2021 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
October 12, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION 3215G |
||
October 12, 2021 | Affidavit of Facts | ||
October 12, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) judgment |
||
October 12, 2021 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Auth |
||
October 12, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Invoice |
||
October 12, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION Statute of Limitations |
||
October 12, 2021 | Affidavit of Military Investigation | ||
June 17, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 28, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - ELEMENT DAY SPA & SALON L.L.C |
||
May 28, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - MICHELLE HOGAN AKA MICHELLE RENEE HOGAN |
||
May 28, 2021 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM |
||
February 26, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
February 26, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |