Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Katherine L Sammarco v. Jason M Sammarco
A Matrimonial - Contested case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Erie County. Judge John O'Donnell presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 18, 2020
Last Refreshed
November 06, 2021
Filing Location
Erie County, NY
Category
Matrimonial - Contested
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Judgment of Divorce,Annulment,Separation
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2021 | JUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK | ||
January 08, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
January 07, 2021 | hearing |
Judgment Granted Part 21 Judge: Martoche, Hon. Amy C. |
|
January 05, 2021 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - SIGNED | ||
January 04, 2021 | hearing |
Held Court Attorney Referee Maxwell FJR IN NYSCEF Judge: O'Donnell, Hon. John F. |
|
December 30, 2020 | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | ||
December 30, 2020 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (PROPOSED) | ||
December 30, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY | ||
December 30, 2020 | SWORN STATEMENT OF REMOVAL OF BARRIERS TO REMARRIAGE | ||
December 30, 2020 | AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY | ||
December 30, 2020 | COMPLAINT | ||
December 30, 2020 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW (PROPOSED) | ||
December 26, 2020 | hearing |
Adjourned Court Attorney Referee Maxwell Judge: O'Donnell, Hon. John F. |
|
December 26, 2020 | hearing |
Court Attorney Referee Maxwell
Judge: O'Donnell, Hon. John F. |
|
December 22, 2020 | hearing |
Held Court Attorney Referee Maxwell TELEPHONE CONFERENCE W/ REFEREE PATRICIA MAXWELL Judge: O'Donnell, Hon. John F. |
|
December 16, 2020 |
PROPERTY/CUSTODY SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT PSA |
||
December 16, 2020 |
AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT Affidavit of Withdrawal and Consent |
||
December 16, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service |
||
December 16, 2020 | CONSENT TO EFILING | ||
December 16, 2020 |
RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE previously filed |
||
December 16, 2020 | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (PRE RJI) | ||
December 16, 2020 | Summons WITH NOTICE | ||
October 22, 2020 | hearing |
Adjourned Expedited Matrimonial TELEPHONE CONFERENCE W/ REFEREE JUDY SAMBER Judge: O'Donnell, Hon. John F. |
|
September 21, 2020 | hearing |
Held Expedited Matrimonial TELEPHONE CONFERENCE W/ REFEREE JUDY SAMBER Judge: O'Donnell, Hon. John F. |
|
September 08, 2020 | hearing |
Held Expedited Matrimonial TELEPHONE CONFERENCE W/ REFEREE JUDY SAMBER Judge: O'Donnell, Hon. John F. |
|
August 17, 2020 | hearing |
Held Expedited Matrimonial TELEPHONE CONFERENCE W/ JUDY SAMBER Judge: O'Donnell, Hon. John F. |
|
August 10, 2020 | hearing |
Adjourned Expedited Matrimonial TELEPHONE CONFERENCE W/ JUDY SAMBER Judge: O'Donnell, Hon. John F. |
|
March 30, 2020 | hearing |
Adjourned Expedited Matrimonial Judge: Keane, Hon. Lynn |
|
February 18, 2020 | hearing |
Held
Judge: Keane, Hon. Lynn |