Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Bank Of America, N.A. v. Dennis W. Neuman
An Other Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Erie County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 17, 2020
Last Refreshed
December 04, 2023
Filing Location
Erie County, NY
Category
Other Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Consumer Debt
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
AFFIDAVIT
Date: Sep 02, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: Sep 02, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Sep 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - 1
Date: Sep 02, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: Sep 02, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: Apr 29, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jan 14, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Jan 14, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Dec 17, 2020SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Dec 17, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - A
Date: Dec 17, 2020Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 02, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
September 02, 2021 | AFFIRMATION | ||
September 02, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 02, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Bank Statement |
||
September 02, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
April 29, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
January 14, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service-DENNIS W NEUMAN -46611771 |
||
January 14, 2021 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM - PVEF |
||
December 17, 2020 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM |
||
December 17, 2020 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT |
||
December 17, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A EXHIBIT A |