Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Bank Of America, N.A. v. Darlene J Oliver
An Other Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Erie County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 15, 2020
Last Refreshed
December 09, 2023
Filing Location
Erie County, NY
Category
Other Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Consumer Debt
Status
Judgment (Other)
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
JUDGMENT
Date: Nov 05, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: May 04, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: Apr 12, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Apr 12, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: Apr 12, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: Apr 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - 1
Date: Apr 12, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jan 07, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Jan 07, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Dec 15, 2020SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Dec 15, 2020EXHIBIT(S) - A
Date: Dec 15, 2020Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2021 | JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on November 05, 2021 | ||
May 04, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
April 12, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
April 12, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 12, 2021 | AFFIRMATION | ||
April 12, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
April 12, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Bank Statement |
||
January 07, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/DARLENE J OLIVER |
||
January 07, 2021 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM |
||
December 15, 2020 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
December 15, 2020 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
December 15, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A |