Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Zachary Maslowski v. Erin Maslowski
A Matrimonial - Uncontested case was filed by Zachary Maslowski, represented by Bullock, Michelle Sardina, against Erin Maslowski, in the jurisdiction of Erie County. Judge Kenneth F Case presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 09, 2021
Last Refreshed
August 06, 2023
Filing Location
Erie County, NY
Category
Matrimonial - Uncontested
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Judgment of Divorce,Annulment,Separation
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
October 11, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
October 11, 2021 | JUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK | ||
October 06, 2021 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - SIGNED | ||
October 04, 2021 | RJI -RE: UNCONTESTED MATRIMONIAL ACTION | ||
October 04, 2021 | PART 130 CERTIFICATION | ||
October 04, 2021 | AFFIRMATION (AFFIDAVIT) OF REGULARITY | ||
October 04, 2021 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | ||
October 04, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT | ||
October 04, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF | ||
October 04, 2021 | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | ||
October 04, 2021 | PROPERTY/CUSTODY SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | ||
October 04, 2021 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW (PROPOSED) | ||
October 04, 2021 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (PROPOSED) | ||
August 09, 2021 | Summons + COMPLAINT |