Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Mary Busenlenher v. Mary Fisher As Chairperson Of The Amherst Paw Park Association, James Joyce As Treasurer Of The Amherst Paw Park Association
A Torts - Other (Premise Liability) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Erie County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 31, 2020
Last Refreshed
October 11, 2023
Filing Location
Erie County, NY
Category
Torts - Other (premise liability)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Premises Liability
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: Sep 26, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Oct 06, 2020ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: Oct 05, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Oct 05, 2020SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Aug 31, 2020Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
October 06, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 05, 2020 | ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) | ||
October 05, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 31, 2020 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |