Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Itria Ventures Llc v. Okada-San Family Health Vivacare Corp., Anthony M Okada
On April 27, 2018 a commercial - contract case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Erie County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 27, 2018
Last Refreshed
July 29, 2023
Filing Location
Erie County, NY
Filing Court House
Erie County Supreme Court
Category
Commercial - Contract
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Status
Confession of Judgment
Case Duration
3 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
JUDGMENT
Date: Apr 30, 2018CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT (AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT)
Date: Apr 27, 2018JUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED)
Date: Apr 27, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on April 30, 2018 | |
April 27, 2018 | Docket Event | CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT (AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT) | |
April 27, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED) |