Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
M&T Bank v. Tara Lynn Young A/K/A TARA L. YOUNG, Secretary Of Housing And Urban Development, John Doe
A Real Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Erie County. Judge Deborah Haendiges presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 27, 2018
Last Refreshed
August 02, 2023
Filing Location
Erie County, NY
Category
Real Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Closed
Case Duration
5 months and 4 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
AFFIDAVIT
Date: Nov 13, 2018NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: Nov 13, 2018ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion 001)
Date: Oct 02, 2018RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Aug 23, 2018ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: Aug 23, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Aug 23, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Aug 23, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: Aug 23, 2018ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: Aug 23, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Apr 27, 2018EXHIBIT(S) - A
Date: Apr 27, 2018NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: Apr 27, 2018CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: Apr 27, 2018EXHIBIT(S) - B
Date: Apr 27, 2018EXHIBIT(S) - A
Date: Apr 27, 2018EXHIBIT(S) - C
Date: Apr 27, 2018SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Apr 27, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2018 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
November 13, 2018 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
October 02, 2018 | ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #001) | ||
September 17, 2018 | hearing |
Closed (Motion #001)
Judge: Haendiges, Deborah A. |
|
August 23, 2018 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) | ||
August 23, 2018 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | ||
August 23, 2018 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 23, 2018 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Filed by RKM 20180413 |
||
August 23, 2018 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
August 23, 2018 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
August 23, 2018 | Motion |
Cancel/Extend Lis Pendens (Motion #001) Decided: 10/01/2018Granted Before Justice: Haendiges, Deborah A. Answer demanded: No Judge: Haendiges, Deborah A. |
|
April 27, 2018 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
April 27, 2018 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A EXHIBIT A of Certificate of Merit |
||
April 27, 2018 | NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
April 27, 2018 | CERTIFICATE OF MERIT | ||
April 27, 2018 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B FORECLOSURE CHAIN AND SUPPORTING DOCS |
||
April 27, 2018 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A DEFENDANT LIST |
||
April 27, 2018 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C LEGAL DESCRIPTION |
||
April 27, 2018 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |