Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Ein Cap, Inc. v. Heckman Home, Inc D/B/A David James Homes, Merle L. Heckman
A Commercial - Contract case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Erie County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 20, 2018
Last Refreshed
August 02, 2023
Filing Location
Erie County, NY
Category
Commercial - Contract
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Status
Confession of Judgment
Case Duration
7 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
STIPULATION - VACATE JUDGMENT
Date: Apr 27, 2018JUDGMENT
Date: Apr 24, 2018JUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED)
Date: Apr 20, 2018CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT (AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT)
Date: Apr 20, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2018 | STIPULATION - VACATE JUDGMENT | ||
April 24, 2018 | JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on April 24, 2018 | ||
April 20, 2018 | JUDGMENT BY CONFESSION (PROPOSED) | ||
April 20, 2018 |
AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS Plaintiff Affidavit |
||
April 20, 2018 | CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT (AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT) |