Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
American Express National Bank v. William Stradtman AKA WILLIAM H STRADTMAN
An Other Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Erie County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 20, 2018
Last Refreshed
September 23, 2023
Filing Location
Erie County, NY
Category
Other Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Consumer Debt
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Duration
1 year, 2 months and 19 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Jul 09, 2019SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: Jul 09, 2019JUDGMENT
Date: Nov 27, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Aug 09, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 11, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Apr 20, 2018SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Apr 20, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2019 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
July 09, 2019 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
November 27, 2018 | JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on November 27, 2018 | ||
August 09, 2018 | Affirmation of Military Investigation | ||
August 09, 2018 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 09, 2018 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Invoice of Service |
||
August 09, 2018 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR EXHIBIT B |
||
August 09, 2018 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR EXHIBIT A |
||
August 09, 2018 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
August 09, 2018 | AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS | ||
August 09, 2018 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR | ||
August 09, 2018 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
May 29, 2018 | COURT NOTICE | ||
May 11, 2018 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM |
||
May 11, 2018 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - WILLIAM STRADTMAN |
||
April 20, 2018 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
April 20, 2018 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |