Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Ursula H Moelbert v. Walter S Toporek Iii a/k/a Walter Toporek
A Real Property - Other (Note) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Erie County. Judge Mark Grisanti presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 20, 2018
Last Refreshed
August 02, 2023
Filing Location
Erie County, NY
Category
Real Property - Other (Note)
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Promissory Note
Status
Default Judgment
Case Duration
6 months and 16 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
JUDGMENT (Motion 001)
Date: Nov 05, 2018JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED)
Date: Nov 02, 2018SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION
Date: Jul 30, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: Jul 26, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: Jul 26, 2018ANSWER
Date: May 23, 2018SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Apr 20, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2019 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
November 05, 2018 |
JUDGMENT (Motion #001) JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on November 05, 2018 |
||
November 05, 2018 | ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT | ||
November 02, 2018 | JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) | ||
October 12, 2018 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Note |
||
October 12, 2018 |
AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES Attorney's Affidavit on Application for Reasonable Attorney's Fees and Costs |
||
August 29, 2018 | hearing |
Granted (Motion #001)
Judge: Grisanti, Hon. Mark J. |
|
August 24, 2018 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001)
Judge: Grisanti, Hon. Mark J. |
|
August 14, 2018 | hearing |
Continued (Motion #001)
Judge: Grisanti, Hon. Mark J. |
|
August 03, 2018 | Motion |
Judgment - Default (Motion #001) Decided: 08/29/2018Granted Before Justice: Grisanti, Hon. Mark J. Answer demanded: No Judge: Grisanti, Hon. Mark J. |
|
July 30, 2018 | SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION | ||
July 26, 2018 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
July 26, 2018 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
July 26, 2018 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #001) Letter from Dragic D. Stevanovic dated May 23, 2018 |
||
July 26, 2018 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) March 22, 2018 Letter |
||
July 26, 2018 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Notice of Rejection Letter |
||
July 26, 2018 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Rejected Answer |
||
July 26, 2018 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Rejected Notice of Appearance |
||
July 26, 2018 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service |
||
July 26, 2018 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Verified Complaint |
||
July 23, 2018 |
RJI -RE: OTHER Judgment-Default |
||
May 25, 2018 | NOTICE OF REJECTION | ||
May 24, 2018 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 23, 2018 | ANSWER | ||
May 23, 2018 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
April 20, 2018 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
April 20, 2018 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Affidavit |
||
April 20, 2018 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Note |