Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Riley Kovatch v. New York State Department Of Health, Vital Records Section
A Special Proceedings - Other (Release Birth Certificate) case was filed by Riley Kovatch, represented by Steves, Bruce David, against New York State Department Of Health, Vital Records Section, in the jurisdiction of Erie County. Judge Lynn W Keane presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 11, 2022
Last Refreshed
November 30, 2023
Filing Location
Erie County, NY
Category
Special Proceedings - Other (Release Birth Certificate)
Status
Closed
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: Jun 20, 2022ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM
Date: Jun 09, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 23, 2022NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S)
Date: May 11, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: May 11, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: May 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - D
Date: May 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - B
Date: May 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - C
Date: May 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - A
Date: May 11, 2022PETITION
Date: May 11, 2022Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
June 09, 2022 | ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM | ||
May 23, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 11, 2022 | NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) | ||
May 11, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
May 11, 2022 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION | ||
May 11, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D George Anthony Kovatch, Jr.'s Birth Certificate |
||
May 11, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E George Anthony Kovatch's Death Certificate Redacted per 22 NYCRR George Anthony Kovatch's Death Certificate Redacted |
||
May 11, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Riley Kovatch's Birth Certificate |
||
May 11, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Michael George Kovatch's Birth Certificate |
||
May 11, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Georgius Kovacs Baptismal Certifiate |
||
May 11, 2022 | PETITION |