Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Nicholas Ivon Sr. v. Anthony Vinson
A Torts - Motor Vehicle case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Erie County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 29, 2021
Last Refreshed
December 09, 2023
Filing Location
Erie County, NY
Category
Torts - Motor Vehicle
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: Dec 20, 2021ANSWER
Date: Jun 11, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 11, 2021SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Apr 29, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2021 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
||
June 11, 2021 | Answer | ||
May 11, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 29, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |