Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Kevin J Kelly as Executor of the Estate of, Loretta T Kelly Deceased v. Brothers Of Mercy Nursing & Rehabilitation Center, Brothers Of Mercy Nursing Home Company, Inc., Brothers Of Mercy, Inc., Brothers Of Mercy Facilities Foundation, Brothers…
A Torts - Other Negligence (Nursing Home Negligence) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Erie County. Judge Frederick J Marshall presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 05, 2018
Last Refreshed
August 02, 2023
Filing Location
Erie County, NY
Category
Torts - Other Negligence (nursing home negligence)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Nursing Home
Status
Settlement
Case Duration
2 years, 3 months and 24 days
Overview
Causes of Action
CAUSE OF ACTION AGAINST THE DEFENDANTS
CAUSE OF ACTION AGAINST THE DEFENDANTS
CAUSE OF ACTION AGAINST THE DEFENDANTS
CAUSE OF ACTION AGAINST THE DEFENDANTS
CAUSE OF ACTION AGAINST THE DEFENDANTS
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Aug 28, 2020ANSWER
Date: Apr 27, 2018SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Apr 05, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 28, 2020 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
July 29, 2020 | hearing |
Settled
Judge: Marshall, Hon. Frederick J. |
|
June 03, 2020 | hearing |
Adjourned Phone conference if Covid 19 restrictions still in place Judge: Marshall, Hon. Frederick J. |
|
April 02, 2020 | hearing |
Rescheduled
Judge: Marshall, Hon. Frederick J. |
|
March 11, 2020 | hearing |
Held
Judge: Marshall, Hon. Frederick J. |
|
February 24, 2020 | hearing |
Adjourned
Judge: Marshall, Hon. Frederick J. |
|
January 08, 2020 | hearing |
Held
Judge: Marshall, Hon. Frederick J. |
|
November 21, 2019 | hearing |
Adjourned
Judge: Marshall, Hon. Frederick J. |
|
August 29, 2019 | hearing |
Held
Judge: Marshall, Hon. Frederick J. |
|
June 11, 2019 | hearing |
Held
Judge: Marshall, Hon. Frederick J. |
|
March 14, 2019 | hearing |
Held
Judge: Marshall, Hon. Frederick J. |
|
March 01, 2019 | hearing |
Held
Judge: Marshall, Hon. Frederick J. |
|
January 16, 2019 | hearing |
Held
Judge: Marshall, Hon. Frederick J. |
|
August 31, 2018 | hearing |
Held
Judge: Marshall, Hon. Frederick J. |
|
August 01, 2018 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
April 27, 2018 | ANSWER | ||
April 16, 2018 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 05, 2018 | CERTIFICATE OF MERIT | ||
April 05, 2018 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |