Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Lvnv Funding Llc v. Dawn H Baker
On April 02, 2018 an other matters - consumer credit (card) debt buyer plaintiff case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Erie County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 02, 2018
Last Refreshed
June 27, 2024
Filing Location
Erie County, NY
Filing Court House
Supreme
Category
Other Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Consumer Debt
Case Duration
1 year, 6 months and 21 days
Overview
Causes of Action
ON INFORMATION AND BELIEF THE CAUSES OF ACTION ASSERTED THEREIN ARE NOT OUTSIDE OF THE APPLICABLE STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS FOR ENFORCING THE DEBT.-
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a legal document filed by LVNV Funding LLC against Dawn H Baker. The complaint alleges that the defendant resides in Erie County, New York, or transacted business within the county, and that the defendant made purchases under a …...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
DEFECT CHECKLIST
Date: Oct 23, 2019AFFIRMATION DOD
Date: Feb 21, 2019AFFIRMATION NON MIL
Date: Feb 21, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF
Date: Feb 21, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR
Date: Feb 21, 2019JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: Feb 21, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS
Date: Feb 21, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF PURCHASE AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT SELLER
Date: Feb 21, 2019COURT NOTICE
Date: May 02, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Apr 19, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Apr 19, 2018SUMMONS COMPLAINT Q64664053315
Date: Apr 02, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFECT CHECKLIST | |
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION DOD DOD Redacted |
|
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION NON MIL NON MIL Redacted |
|
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
|
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
|
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
|
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
|
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF PURCHASE AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT SELLER Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
|
May 02, 2018 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
April 19, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
April 19, 2018 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Q64664053315 Q64664053315 Redacted |