Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Midland Funding Llc v. Alex Nowosiadly
On January 24, 2019 an other matters - consumer credit (card) debt buyer plaintiff case was filed by Midland Funding Llc, represented by Einstein, Stephen, against Alex Nowosiadly, in the jurisdiction of Erie County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 24, 2019
Last Refreshed
August 01, 2023
Filing Location
Erie County, NY
Filing Court House
Erie County Supreme Court
Category
Other Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Consumer Debt
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Jan 24, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Jan 24, 2019Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Notice of Sale to Defendant |
|
September 11, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFECT CHECKLIST | |
May 09, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION | |
May 09, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS | |
May 09, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR | |
May 09, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF | |
May 09, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | |
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
March 25, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | |
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |