Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Midland Credit Management, Inc. v. Victoria Coyle
An Other Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff case was filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc., represented by Poulin, Anthony Scott, against Victoria Coyle, in the jurisdiction of Dutchess County, NY.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 17, 2021
Last Refreshed
August 02, 2023
Filing Location
Dutchess County, NY
Category
Other Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Consumer Debt
Status
Judgment (Other)
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
JUDGMENT Corrected
Date: Apr 05, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: Jan 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jan 28, 2022JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Corrected
Date: Jan 28, 2022202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING
Date: Dec 09, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Oct 18, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Oct 18, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Sep 17, 2021SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Sep 17, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2022 |
JUDGMENT *Corrected* As entered by County Clerk |
||
January 28, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
January 28, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 28, 2022 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected* TMP#430648 |
||
December 09, 2021 |
202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING MAILED 12/9/21 |
||
October 18, 2021 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM - PVEF |
||
October 18, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Unfiled Affidavit of Service-Victoria Coyle-48664088 |
||
September 17, 2021 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM |
||
September 17, 2021 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS & COMPLAINT |