Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
The Sherwin-Williams Company v. John Vogstad D/B/A APACHE WOOD FLOOR DISTRIBUTORS
A Commercial - Contract case was filed by The Sherwin-Williams Company, represented by Gottlieb, Warren S, against John Vogstad D B A Apache Wood Floor Distributors, in the jurisdiction of Dutchess County, NY.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 15, 2021
Last Refreshed
October 12, 2023
Filing Location
Dutchess County, NY
Category
Commercial - Contract
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: May 02, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Dec 01, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Dec 01, 2021SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Sep 15, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2022 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
December 01, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 01, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 15, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |