Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Jacinth Garrick-Stephenson v. Dyani A. Sanders, Cheryl Pender
A Torts - Motor Vehicle case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Dutchess County, NY. Judge Christie D'Alessio presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 15, 2021
Last Refreshed
December 03, 2023
Filing Location
Dutchess County, NY
Judge
Hon. Christie D'Alessio
Category
Torts - Motor Vehicle
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Closed
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
SUMMONS COMPLAINT Corrected
Date: Sep 15, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
June 16, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
June 16, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
May 18, 2022 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
May 16, 2022 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
April 25, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
April 25, 2022 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
October 22, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS Cheryl Pender |
||
October 22, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS Dyani Sanders by suitable person |
||
October 05, 2021 | Answer and Demands | ||
September 21, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Notice of Commencement of Action for Personal Injuries |
||
September 21, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 15, 2021 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected* summons and complaint |