Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Martin L. Logsdon Sr., Individually and as Administrator of the ESTATE OF MARTIN L. LOGSDON JR. v. Allen R. Emrich, Catena Unlimited, Llc d/b/a LAKE STREET LANES
A Torts - Motor Vehicle case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Chenango County, NY. Judge Joseph A. Mcbride presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 23, 2021
Last Refreshed
October 10, 2023
Filing Location
Chenango County, NY
Category
Torts - Motor Vehicle
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Closed
Overview
Causes of Action
1. AGAINST DEFENDANT, ALLEN R. EMRICH
2. AGAINST DEFENDANT, ALLEN R. EMRICH
3. AGAINST DEFENDANT, ALLEN R. EMRICH
4. AGAINST DEFENDANT, ALLEN R. EMRICH
5. AGAINST DEFENDANT, CATENA UNLIMITED, LLC d/b/a LAKE STREET LANES
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: Oct 04, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: Oct 04, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: Sep 28, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: Aug 23, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: Aug 22, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 31, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: May 09, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: May 09, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: Apr 11, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: Apr 08, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: Apr 08, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: Apr 08, 2022RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: Apr 08, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: Apr 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - B
Date: Apr 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - A
Date: Apr 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - A
Date: Apr 08, 2022ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: Oct 26, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Oct 08, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: Oct 05, 2021ANSWER
Date: Oct 05, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Sep 30, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Sep 27, 2021SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Sep 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - B
Date: Sep 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) - A
Date: Sep 23, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED Entered by County Clerk |
||
October 04, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
September 28, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE with Decree from Surrogate's Court re Settlement |
||
August 23, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE corrected |
||
August 22, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE with proof of Petition to Surrogate's Court |
||
May 31, 2022 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE |
||
May 09, 2022 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
May 09, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER Entered by County Clerk |
||
April 11, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Judicial Assignment Notice |
||
April 08, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
April 08, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Attorney Affidavit |
||
April 08, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
April 08, 2022 |
RJI -RE: OTHER EPTL Section 5-4.6 |
||
April 08, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Affidavit of Martin L. Logsdon, Sr. |
||
April 08, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Summary of Disbursements |
||
April 08, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Letters of Administration |
||
April 08, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Retainer Agreement |
||
October 26, 2021 |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIMS |
||
October 08, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 05, 2021 | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION | ||
October 05, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
September 30, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 27, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 23, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
September 23, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Transcript of Plea Agreement |
||
September 23, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Letters of Administration |