Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Robert Boyce v. Jmp Unique Cleaning Services Corp, Julio C Paula, Anthony C Rossi, David J Mansfield
A Torts - Motor Vehicle case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Cayuga County, NY.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 05, 2021
Last Refreshed
August 02, 2023
Filing Location
Cayuga County, NY
Category
Torts - Motor Vehicle
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: Apr 14, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: Feb 25, 2022NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: Jun 23, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: Jun 23, 2021ANSWER
Date: Jun 04, 2021ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: Jun 04, 2021ANSWER
Date: Jun 03, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: Jun 03, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: Jun 03, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: Jun 03, 2021ANSWER
Date: May 28, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 24, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 17, 2021SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: May 05, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 14, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
February 25, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
June 23, 2021 | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION | ||
June 23, 2021 | DEMAND FOR: | ||
June 04, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
June 04, 2021 | ANSWER (AMENDED) | ||
June 03, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
June 03, 2021 | DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS | ||
June 03, 2021 | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION | ||
June 03, 2021 | DEMAND FOR: | ||
May 28, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
May 24, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 17, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 05, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |