Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
John A. Lopez v. D'Arrigo Delivery, Inc., Allegiance Trucks, Llc, Michael W. Lawrence, Maria N. Garcia, Carlos Abreu
A Torts - Motor Vehicle case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Bronx County. Judge Ben Barbato presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 20, 2022
Last Refreshed
December 05, 2023
Filing Location
Bronx County, NY
Category
Torts - Motor Vehicle
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Consolidation
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
DEMAND FOR:
Date: Sep 28, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Aug 17, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Aug 17, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Aug 17, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: May 05, 2023RJI -RE: OTHER Corrected
Date: Mar 27, 2023STIPULATION - CONSOLIDATION ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: Mar 27, 2023ANSWER
Date: Feb 23, 2023SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Dec 20, 2022Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Demand for Authorizations |
||
August 17, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint on Defendant, Michael W. Lawrence |
||
August 17, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint on Defendant, Maria N. Garcia |
||
August 17, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint on Defendant, Carlos Abreu |
||
May 05, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Good Faith Letter to Plaintiff for a Bill of Particulars |
||
March 27, 2023 |
RJI -RE: OTHER *Corrected* Stipulation to Consolidate - Request to So Order |
||
March 27, 2023 | STIPULATION - CONSOLIDATION ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
February 23, 2023 | ANSWER | ||
February 23, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars, Request for Supplemental Demand for Relief, Combined Demand Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars, Request for Supplemental Demand for Relief, Combined Demand ... show more |
||
February 02, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint on Defendant, D'arrigo Delivery, Inc. via Secretary of S Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint on Defendant, D'arrigo Delivery, Inc. via Secretary of S ... show more |
||
February 02, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint on Defendant, Allegiance Trucks, LLC via Secretary of St Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint on Defendant, Allegiance Trucks, LLC via Secretary of St ... show more |
||
December 20, 2022 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Verified Summons + Complaint |