Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Midfirst Bank v. Novelette Clayton, Secretary Of Housing And Urban Development, Norstar Bank, Bronx County Clerk, New York City Environmental Control Board, New York City Parking Violations Bureau, New York City Transit Adjudication Bureau, John Doe…
A Real Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Bronx County. Judge Master Foreclosure Judge presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 19, 2022
Last Refreshed
July 26, 2023
Filing Location
Bronx County, NY
Judge
Hon. Master Foreclosure Judge
Category
Real Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Overview
Causes of Action
1. ACTION TO DETERMINE CLAIM TO REAL PROPERTY
2. FORECLOSURE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
AFFIRMATION
Date: Jun 07, 2023STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: Jun 07, 2023STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Jun 07, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jan 25, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jan 25, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jan 25, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jan 25, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Jan 23, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jan 23, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jan 22, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Jan 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jan 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jan 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jan 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jan 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jan 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jan 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jan 22, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Jan 12, 2023ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: Jan 12, 2023RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: Jan 12, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: Jan 12, 2023SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Dec 19, 2022NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: Dec 19, 2022CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: Dec 19, 2022Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2023 | AFFIRMATION | ||
June 07, 2023 | STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
June 07, 2023 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
January 25, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service_Norstar Bank |
||
January 25, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service_Bronx County Clerk |
||
January 25, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos Bronx County Clerk |
||
January 25, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aos Norstar Bank |
||
January 23, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
January 23, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD |
||
January 22, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing - Novelette Clayton |
||
January 22, 2023 | Statement of Authorization for Electronic Filing | ||
January 22, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Novelette Clayton |
||
January 22, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Secretary of Housing and Urban Development |
||
January 22, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - NYC Parking Violations Bureau |
||
January 22, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Jason Clayton as John Doe #1 |
||
January 22, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - NYC Transit Adjudication Bureau |
||
January 22, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing - Secretary of Housing and Urban Development |
||
January 22, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Tenant Mailing - Jason Clayton as John Doe #1 |
||
January 12, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
January 12, 2023 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | ||
January 12, 2023 | RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
January 12, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 19, 2022 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
December 19, 2022 | NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
December 19, 2022 | CERTIFICATE OF MERIT |