Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Vatra (The Pan-Albanian Federation Of America) v. Agustin Mirakaj, Nazo Veliu, Mark Mernaci
A Commercial - Other (Non-Profit Organization) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Bronx County. Judge Andrew J Cohen presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 27, 2024
Last Refreshed
March 01, 2024
Filing Location
Bronx County, NY
Judge
Hon. Andrew J Cohen
Category
Commercial - Other (Non-Profit Organization)
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
General Commercial
Overview
VATRA is the oldest Albanian American non-profit association, today being
over 112 years old.
Founded by revered authors and national heroes including Fan Noli and Faik
Konica, VATRA has sought to uphold the rights of Albanians, and promote and preserve the
Albanian culture across the globe.
VATRA has met, worked with and lobbied power institutions in pursuit of its
purpose, including the US Congress, Senate, the Vatican, the Pope and more.
Defendants are rogue and illegal chapter members of VATRA, seeking to
overthrow VATRA’s duly elected leadership by force, by engaging in a vile defamatory
campaign and breaking and entering into its headquarters.
This action seeks to hold Defendants responsible for the violent and illegal effort
to depose and bring down a well-respected institution in the Albanian-American community.
Case Complaint Summary
The legal complaint filed by VATRA in the Bronx County Supreme Court accuses defendants Agustin Mirakaj, Nazo Veliu, and Mark Mernaci, rogue chapter members, of attempting to overthrow VATRA's elected leadership through illegal means. The complai…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: Feb 29, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion 1)
Date: Feb 29, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion 1)
Date: Feb 29, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion 1)
Date: Feb 29, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion 1)
Date: Feb 29, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion 1)
Date: Feb 29, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 1)
Date: Feb 29, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 1)
Date: Feb 29, 2024AFFIRMATION (Motion 1)
Date: Feb 29, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion 1)
Date: Feb 29, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion 1)
Date: Feb 29, 2024ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion 1)
Date: Feb 29, 2024SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Feb 27, 2024Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 29, 2024 | RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
February 29, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) Exhibit F - NYPD Incident Information Slip |
||
February 29, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Exhibit C - Newspaper Article About Dr. Camaj Election as Secretary |
||
February 29, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Exhibit E - Receipt for Lock Repair (3 times) |
||
February 29, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Exhibit D - Defendants Breaking In VATRA's Headquarters |
||
February 29, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mr. Berisha, VATRA President |
||
February 29, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Exhibit B - Newspaper Article Writing About Mr. Berisha's Election |
||
February 29, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Exhibit A - VATRA's Current By Laws |
||
February 29, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) UCE 202.7(f) Affirmation |
||
February 29, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #1) Attorney Affirmation in Support |
||
February 29, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Dr. Camaj, VATRA Secretary |
||
February 29, 2024 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) Proposed OSC with TRO |
||
February 27, 2024 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint |