Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Quilivin Polanco Deleon v. 630 Tenth Avenue Llc
A Torts - Other Negligence (Personal Injury) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Bronx County. Judge Doris Gonzalez presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 31, 2022
Last Refreshed
October 05, 2023
Filing Location
Bronx County, NY
Category
Torts - Other Negligence (Personal Injury)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Personal Injury
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: Feb 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - L
Date: Feb 07, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion 3)
Date: Jan 31, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion 3)
Date: Jan 31, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion 3)
Date: Jan 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 3)
Date: Jan 30, 2023AFFIDAVIT (Motion 3)
Date: Jan 30, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion 3)
Date: Jan 30, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: Jan 24, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Jan 20, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion 3)
Date: Jan 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion 3)
Date: Jan 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion 3)
Date: Jan 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion 3)
Date: Jan 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion 3)
Date: Jan 19, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion 3)
Date: Jan 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion 3)
Date: Jan 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion 3)
Date: Jan 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion 3)
Date: Jan 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion 3)
Date: Jan 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion 3) Plaintiffs C3 Form dated June 6, 2016
Date: Jan 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion 3)
Date: Jan 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion 3)
Date: Jan 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion 3)
Date: Jan 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion 3)
Date: Jan 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion 3)
Date: Jan 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: Nov 15, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: Nov 03, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: Nov 02, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: Oct 31, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: Oct 27, 2022SUBPOENA ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: Oct 24, 2022SUBPOENA ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: Oct 21, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: Oct 20, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: Oct 20, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: Oct 20, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: Oct 20, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: Oct 20, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: Oct 20, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: Oct 20, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: Oct 20, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Sep 29, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Aug 16, 2022SUBPOENA ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: Aug 16, 2022COUNTY CLERK MINUTES - PRIOR TO CONVERSION (SUBSEQUENT)
Date: Apr 11, 2022APPROVED - LETTER APPLICATION TO CONVERT TO E-FILING
Date: Apr 11, 2022RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: Apr 11, 2022LETTER APPLICATION TO CONVERT TO E-FILING (WITH PROOF OF SERVICE)
Date: Mar 31, 2022Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Affirmation in Support to Order to Show Cause |
||
February 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - L Exhibit L - Email |
||
January 31, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3) Affidavit of Service + Legal Back for Plaintiff's Supplemental Affirmation in Opposition |
||
January 31, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #3) Plaintiff's Supplemental Affirmation in Opposition to Defendant's OSC to Amend Answer |
||
January 30, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #3) Affirmation in Opposition |
||
January 30, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #3) Defendant's Letter dated 1.22.21 to NYS Worker's Comp Board and other Plaintiff's Responses enclosin ... show more Defendant's Letter dated 1.22.21 to NYS Worker's Comp Board and other Plaintiff's Responses enclosin ... show more Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
January 30, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) Proof of Defendant's late submission of motion via FEDEX Priority Overnight |
||
January 30, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #3) Plaintiff's Notice of Availability dated October 31, 2017 and Combined Response to D&I dated Septemb ... show more Plaintiff's Notice of Availability dated October 31, 2017 and Combined Response to D&I dated Septemb ... show more Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
January 30, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #3) Affidavit of Service and Legal Back |
||
January 30, 2023 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #3) Statement of Authorization |
||
January 24, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Expert Witness Disclosure (Dr. Lewis Rothman) |
||
January 23, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #3) Affidavit of Service via FedEx Priority Overnight Service of OSC Affidavit of Service via FedEx Priority Overnight Service of OSC Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
January 23, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #3) Replacing document # 40-Affidavit of Service via FedEx Priority Overnight Service of OSC Replacing document # 40-Affidavit of Service via FedEx Priority Overnight Service of OSC Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
January 20, 2023 |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Trial Counsel |
||
January 19, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #3) Memorandum of Law in Support of Order to Show Cause |
||
January 19, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #3) Defendant's Verified Answer |
||
January 19, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #3) Defendant's Substitution of Counsel |
||
January 19, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #3) Affirmation in Support of OTSC to Dismiss |
||
January 19, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) Plaintiff's Summons and Complaint |
||
January 19, 2023 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #3) Proposed Order to Show Cause |
||
January 19, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #3) Transcript from WCB Hearing dated September 27, 2016 |
||
January 19, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #3) WCB Denial of Plaintiff's Application for review |
||
January 19, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #3) Plaintiff's C3 Form dated June 14, 2016 |
||
January 19, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #3) WCB Memo of Board Panel Decision |
||
January 19, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #3) Plaintiff's C3 Form dated June 6, 2016 Plaintiff's C3 Form dated June 6, 2016 Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
January 19, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #3) Transcript of Telephonic WC EBT dated November 7, 2016 |
||
January 19, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #3) Transcript from WC Hearing dated March 30, 2017 |
||
January 19, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #3) Transcript from WC Hearing dated February 13, 2017 |
||
January 19, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #3) WCB Notice of Decision dated April 4, 2017 |
||
January 19, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #3) Transcript From December 5, 2016 WC Hearing |
||
November 15, 2022 | Affidavits of Service of Subpoenas | ||
November 03, 2022 | Affidavits of Service - Trial Subpoenas | ||
November 02, 2022 | Affidavits of Service for Trial Subpoenas served | ||
October 31, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER Dated 10/26/2022 |
||
October 27, 2022 | Affidavits of Service for Updated Trial Subpoenas | ||
October 24, 2022 |
SUBPOENA ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
October 21, 2022 |
SUBPOENA ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
October 20, 2022 | Affidavit of Service for Trial Subpoena - Joshua Auerbach, M.D. | ||
October 20, 2022 | Affidavit of Service for Trial Subpoena - Gregory Emili, M.D. | ||
October 20, 2022 | Affidavit of Service for Trial Subpoena - Alfredo Fiad, M.D. | ||
October 20, 2022 | Affidavit of Service for Trial Subpoena - Balm of Gilead Medical Office | ||
October 20, 2022 | Affidavit of Service for Trial Subpoena - Bronx Lebanon Hospital | ||
October 20, 2022 | Affidavit of Service for Trial Subpoena - Third Ave MRI | ||
October 20, 2022 | Affidavit of Service for Trial Subpoena - Michael Gerling, M.D. | ||
October 20, 2022 | Affidavit of Service for Trial Subpoena - Morrisania Neighborhood | ||
September 29, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
August 16, 2022 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Authorization |
||
August 16, 2022 |
SUBPOENA ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
April 11, 2022 | COUNTY CLERK MINUTES - PRIOR TO CONVERSION (SUBSEQUENT) | ||
April 11, 2022 | APPROVED - LETTER APPLICATION TO CONVERT TO E-FILING | ||
April 11, 2022 | RJI -RE: OTHER | ||
March 31, 2022 |
LETTER APPLICATION TO CONVERT TO E-FILING (WITH PROOF OF SERVICE) Index No: 302708/2016 |