Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Ball vs. Midnight Deli & Grocery
An Other case was filed in the jurisdiction of Albany County. Judge RICHARD M. PLATKIN presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 10, 2019
Last Refreshed
October 15, 2021
Filing Location
Albany County, NY
Case Duration
2 months and 5 days
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2020 | hearing |
PRE-JUDGEMENT PLATKIN (Court Activity) Judge: RICHARD M. PLATKIN |
|
February 14, 2020 | hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) PLATKIN (Motion Part) Judge: RICHARD M. PLATKIN |
|
January 27, 2020 | hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) PLATKIN (Motion Part) Judge: RICHARD M. PLATKIN |
|
December 10, 2019 | hearing |
NOTE OF ISSUE FILED PLATKIN (Court Activity) Judge: RICHARD M. PLATKIN |
|
December 10, 2019 | hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) PLATKIN (Motion Part) Judge: RICHARD M. PLATKIN |
|
December 10, 2019 | Motion |
Default Judgment (Motion #001) Decided: 02/14/2020GRANTED Before Justice: RICHARD M. PLATKIN Answer demanded: No Judge: RICHARD M. PLATKIN |