Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
William Scott Belfar v. New York State Department Of Education, New York State Board Of Regents Of The University Of The State Of New York, Betty A. Rosa in her capacity as Commissioner of the New York State Education Department, New York State Depa…
A Special Proceedings - Cplr Article 78 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Albany County, NY.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 29, 2024
Last Refreshed
March 03, 2024
Filing Location
Albany County, NY
Category
Special Proceedings - CPLR Article 78
Practice Area
Administrative
Matter Type
Agency Action
Status
Active
Case Complaint Summary
The legal document is a complaint filed by William Scott Belfar against the New York State Department of Education, the New York State Board of Regents, and others, seeking to set aside a determination regarding the reinstatement of his medical l…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: Feb 29, 2024RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: Feb 29, 2024NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: Feb 29, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 8
Date: Feb 29, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 7
Date: Feb 29, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 6
Date: Feb 29, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 5
Date: Feb 29, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 4
Date: Feb 29, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 3
Date: Feb 29, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 2
Date: Feb 29, 2024EXHIBIT(S) - 1
Date: Feb 29, 2024PETITION
Date: Feb 29, 2024Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 29, 2024 | ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) | ||
February 29, 2024 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION | ||
February 29, 2024 | Notice of Petition | ||
February 29, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 8 Chart Incorporated into Paragraph 82 of the Petition |
||
February 29, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 7 Petitioner's Response to the CoP draft report |
||
February 29, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 6 Final Report from the Committee on the Professions |
||
February 29, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5 Federal Court Order dated Feb 3, 2023 |
||
February 29, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 Transcript from the Peer Review Committee hearing |
||
February 29, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 Report of the Peer Review Committee |
||
February 29, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Cover Letter dated Nov 29, 2023 |
||
February 29, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Order of October 30, 2023 which is the Subject of the Article 78 |
||
February 29, 2024 |
PETITION Verified Petition |