Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Discover Bank v. Oscar J Munoz
A Debt And Money Due case was filed by Discover Bank, represented by Guglielmo Eliza Ann, against Munoz Oscar J, in the jurisdiction of Dona Ana County, NM. Judge Driggers, Douglas R. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 05, 2023
Last Refreshed
January 24, 2024
Filing Location
Dona Ana County, NM
Category
Debt and Money Due
Case Outcome Type
Default Judgment Entered
Status
Default Judgment
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
NCJ: AMENDED JUDGMENT/ORDER Amended Judgment - $14,154.94 |
|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | RPN: REOPEN NO FEE PAID | |
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
MTN: MOTION TO AMEND/ MODIFY MOTION TO AMEND JUDGMENT |
|
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
CLS: JUDGMENT/DEFAULT Default Judgment - against Deft, Oscar J Munoz for the following amount: Total Judgment $13,420.57, plus 8.75% interest per annum |
|
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
MTN: MOTION/APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FILED FOR NON-MILITARY |
|
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
NTC: NOTICE NOTICE OF DEFAULT |
|
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT | |
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE AS TO THE STATE OF THE RECORD CERITIFCATE AS TO THE STATE OF THE RECORD |
|
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons Return To Jesus Grijalva On Behalf Of Oscar Munoz Through Personal Service On 01-28-2023 | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
DCM (Differentiated Case Management) Scheduling Order Order Requiring Scheduling Reports and a Discovery Plan, Expert Witness Disclosure, and Limiting Stipulations to Enlarge Time for Responsive Pleadings. |
|
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
OPN: COMPLAINT Civil Complaint Account Stated or Breach of Contract |
|
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
OPN: COMPLAINT Complaint |