Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Millennium Anesthesi Vs Joseph Chantal
A Contract Dispute case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Essex County, NJ. Judge Eugene J. Codey presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 12, 2011
Last Refreshed
November 29, 2022
Filing Location
Essex County, NJ
Judge
Category
Contract Dispute
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Case Outcome Type
Default By Clerk
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2012 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO TURN OVER FUNDS
Judge: RACHEL N DAVIDSON |
||
November 18, 2011 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO TURN OVER FUNDS
Judge: RACHEL N DAVIDSON |
||
September 21, 2011 |
TRIAL
Judge: ANY JUDGE |
||
August 19, 2011 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Judge: EUGENE J CODEY |