Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Td Bank Vs Yentch John
A Contract Dispute case was filed by Td Bank N.A., represented by Scott J Best, against John Yentch, in the jurisdiction of Cape May County, NJ.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 31, 2017
Last Refreshed
November 17, 2022
Filing Location
Cape May County, NJ
Category
Contract Dispute
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Case Outcome Type
Default Judgment
Status
Default Judgment
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Judgment Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: Aug 07, 2018Summons Mailed Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: Jun 01, 2017Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Judgment Notice submitted by Case Management | |
August 02, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT OUT OF TIME-Granted by Judge J CHRISTOPHER GIBSON, JSC re: MOTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT OUT OF TIME [SCP2018923538] | |
May 10, 2018 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT OUT OF TIME
Judge: JSC J CHRISTOPHER GIBSON |
||
April 27, 2018 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 04/26/2018 will be decided on 05/10/2018. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT OUT OF TIME [SCP2018923538] | |
April 26, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT OUT OF TIME submitted by BEST, SCOTT, J of WELTMAN WEINBERG & REIS CO LPA on behalf of TD BANK N.A. against JOHN YENTCH | |
June 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Return Service - Served uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by JOHN YENTCH | |
June 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Summons Mailed Notice submitted by Case Management | |
May 31, 2017 | Docket Event | A Complaint for CPM-DC-001068-17 submitted by BEST, SCOTT J, WELTMAN WEINBERG & REIS CO LPA on behalf of TD BANK, N.A. against JOHN YENTCH |