Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Pandelo Corinne Vs The Governing Body O F Jehova
A Personal Injury case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Bergen County, NJ. Judge Gregg A Padovano presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 18, 2021
Last Refreshed
December 24, 2023
Filing Location
Bergen County, NJ
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Estela M De;Category
Personal Injury
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Personal Injury
Case Outcome Type
Open
Status
Active
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Overview
Plaintiff CORINNE PANDELO (hereinafter “PLAINTIFF”) brings this action to
seek redress for the sexual abuse she suffered at the hands of Clement Pandelo (“Pandelo”), an
agent of Defendant THE GOVERNING BODY OF JEHOVAH’S WITNESSES (“GOVERNING
Causes of Action
CAUSES OF ACTION AGAINST DEFENDANTS
COUNT I – NEGLIGENCE AND/OR GROSS NEGLIGENCE
COUNT II – NEGLIGENT AND/OR GROSSLY NEGLIGENT SUPERVISION Plaintiff v. All Defendants
COUNT III – NEGLIGENT AND/OR GROSSLY NEGLIGENT RETENTION Plaintiff v. All Defendants
COUNT IV – NEGLIGENT AND/OR GROSSLY NEGLIGENT FAILURE TO TRAIN RELATING TO CHILD ABUSE Plaintiff v. All Defendants
COUNT V – INTENTIONAL INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS
COUNT VI – NEGLIGENT INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS Plaintiff v. All Defendants
COUNT VII – SEXUAL ABUSE AND BATTERY
COUNT VIII – PUNITIVE DAMAGES Plaintiff v. All Defendants
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Management Order-Court Initiated - GRANTED by Judge PADOVANO, GREGG, A
Date: Aug 03, 2023DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: Jun 26, 2023Consent Order - GRANTED by Judge PADOVANO, GREGG, A
Date: Mar 09, 2023DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: Aug 15, 2022DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: Jun 20, 2022LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: May 07, 2022Order For Discovery - GRANTED by Judge DE LA CRUZ, ESTELA, M
Date: Apr 12, 2022LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL ORDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: Mar 05, 2022LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: Jan 01, 2022TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: Aug 19, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2024 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE
Judge: GREGG A PADOVANO |
||
December 21, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by KORGUL, MARGARET, T of MARKORLAW LLC on behalf of FAIRLAWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES against CORINNE PANDELO | |
December 21, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 12/20/2023 will be decided on 01/05/2024. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE [LCV20233684481] | |
December 21, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 12/20/2023 will be decided on 01/05/2024. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE [LCV20233684468] | |
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE submitted by KESSLER, RAYNA, ELIZABETH of ROBINS KAPLAN LLP on behalf of CORINNE PANDELO against THE GOVERNING BODY OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, FAIRLAWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, WATCHTOWER BIBLE AND TRACT SOCIETY OF NEW YORK, HACKENSACK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-100 | |
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO COMPEL DISCOVERY-Partial by Judge PADOVANO, GREGG, A re: MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY [LCV20233316950] | |
December 01, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY
Judge: GREGG A PADOVANO |
||
November 28, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (NOT THE FIRST PAPER) [LCV20233452383] -Notice of appearance not entered as attorney is not associated to firm. | |
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event | REPLY BRIEF submitted by KESSLER, RAYNA, ELIZABETH of ROBINS KAPLAN LLP on behalf of CORINNE PANDELO against THE GOVERNING BODY OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, FAIRLAWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, WATCHTOWER BIBLE AND TRACT SOCIETY OF NEW YORK, HACKENSACK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-100 *LINKED FILING* | |
November 24, 2023 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by YAMMINE, REYMOND, E of K&L GATES LLP on behalf of WATCHTOWER BIBLE AND TRACT SOCIETY OF NEW YORK, HACKENSACK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES against CORINNE PANDELO *LINKED FILING* | |
November 24, 2023 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by KORGUL, MARGARET, T of MARKORLAW LLC on behalf of FAIRLAWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES against CORINNE PANDELO *LINKED FILING* | |
November 22, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (NOT THE FIRST PAPER) submitted by YAMMINE, REYMOND, E of K&L GATES LLP on behalf of WATCHTOWER BIBLE AND TRACT SOCIETY OF NEW YORK, HACKENSACK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES against CORINNE PANDELO | |
November 09, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 11/07/2023 will be decided on 12/01/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY [LCV20233316950] | |
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY [LCV20233316950] -Movant shall provide the court with a courtesy copy of the motion directly to chambers: Judge Padovano, 10 Main Street, Courtroom 359, Hackensack, N.J. 07601 | |
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY submitted by KESSLER, RAYNA, ELIZABETH of ROBINS KAPLAN LLP on behalf of CORINNE PANDELO against THE GOVERNING BODY OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, FAIRLAWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, WATCHTOWER BIBLE AND TRACT SOCIETY OF NEW YORK, HACKENSACK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-100 *LINKED FILING* | |
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by KESSLER, RAYNA, ELIZABETH of ROBINS KAPLAN LLP on behalf of CORINNE PANDELO against THE GOVERNING BODY OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, FAIRLAWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, WATCHTOWER BIBLE AND TRACT SOCIETY OF NEW YORK, HACKENSACK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-100 | |
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Order-Court Initiated - GRANTED by Judge PADOVANO, GREGG, A | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by KESSLER, RAYNA, ELIZABETH of ROBINS KAPLAN LLP on behalf of CORINNE PANDELO against THE GOVERNING BODY OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, FAIRLAWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, WATCHTOWER BIBLE AND TRACT SOCIETY OF NEW YORK, HACKENSACK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-100 | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by KESSLER, RAYNA, ELIZABETH of ROBINS KAPLAN LLP on behalf of CORINNE PANDELO against THE GOVERNING BODY OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, FAIRLAWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, WATCHTOWER BIBLE AND TRACT SOCIETY OF NEW YORK, HACKENSACK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-100 | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
March 17, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Judge: GREGG A PADOVANO |
||
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Consent Order - GRANTED by Judge PADOVANO, GREGG, A | |
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE submitted by KESSLER, RAYNA, ELIZABETH of ROBINS KAPLAN LLP on behalf of CORINNE PANDELO against THE GOVERNING BODY OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, FAIRLAWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, WATCHTOWER BIBLE AND TRACT SOCIETY OF NEW YORK, HACKENSACK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-100 *LINKED FILING* | |
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Result: Withdrawn on 03/09/2023 re: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER [LCV2023580781] | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE submitted by KESSLER, RAYNA, ELIZABETH of ROBINS KAPLAN LLP on behalf of CORINNE PANDELO against THE GOVERNING BODY OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, FAIRLAWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, WATCHTOWER BIBLE AND TRACT SOCIETY OF NEW YORK, HACKENSACK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-100 *LINKED FILING* | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER submitted by KESSLER, RAYNA, ELIZABETH of ROBINS KAPLAN LLP on behalf of CORINNE PANDELO against THE GOVERNING BODY OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, FAIRLAWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, WATCHTOWER BIBLE AND TRACT SOCIETY OF NEW YORK, HACKENSACK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-100 *LINKED FILING* | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 02/16/2023 will be decided on 03/17/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER [LCV2023580781] | |
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT-Denied by Judge PADOVANO, GREGG, A re: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [LCV20222677645] | |
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT-Denied by Judge PADOVANO, GREGG, A re: CROSS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [LCV20223274901] | |
October 21, 2022 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Judge: GREGG A PADOVANO |
||
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [LCV20222677645] -Oral argument for the pending motions has been scheduled for Friday, October 21, 2022 at 9:30 AM. | |
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by PARKER, DANA, BETH of K&L GATES LLP on behalf of WATCHTOWER BIBLE AND TRACT SOCIETY OF NEW YORK, HACKENSACK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES against CORINNE PANDELO | |
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER EXTEND DISCOVERY-Granted by Judge PADOVANO, GREGG, A re: MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY [LCV20223335318] | |
October 07, 2022 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Judge: GREGG A PADOVANO |
||
October 07, 2022 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY
Judge: GREGG A PADOVANO |
||
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [LCV20222677645] -The pending motions have been adjourned to Friday, October 21. Oral argument will be rescheduled by the court. | |
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 09/09/2022 was rescheduled to 10/21/2022. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: CROSS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [LCV20223274901] | |
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 07/20/2022 was rescheduled to 10/21/2022. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [LCV20222677645] | |
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event | ADJOURNMENT REQUEST submitted by KESSLER, RAYNA, ELIZABETH of ROBINS KAPLAN LLP on behalf of CORINNE PANDELO against THE GOVERNING BODY OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, FAIRLAWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, WATCHTOWER BIBLE AND TRACT SOCIETY OF NEW YORK, HACKENSACK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-100 | |
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [LCV20222677645] -Oral argument for the pending motions has been scheduled for Friday, October 7, 2022 at 9:30 AM. MOVANT SHALL PROVIDE THE COURT AND ALL PARTIES WITH A CALL-IN TELEPHONE NUMBER FOR THE ORAL ARGUMENT. | |
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by PARKER, DANA, BETH of K&L GATES LLP on behalf of WATCHTOWER BIBLE AND TRACT SOCIETY OF NEW YORK, HACKENSACK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES against CORINNE PANDELO | |
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE submitted by KESSLER, RAYNA, ELIZABETH of ROBINS KAPLAN LLP on behalf of CORINNE PANDELO against THE GOVERNING BODY OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, FAIRLAWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, WATCHTOWER BIBLE AND TRACT SOCIETY OF NEW YORK, HACKENSACK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-100 *LINKED FILING* | |
September 23, 2022 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Judge: GREGG A PADOVANO |
||
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 07/20/2022 was rescheduled to 10/07/2022. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [LCV20222677645] | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 09/09/2022 was rescheduled to 10/07/2022. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: CROSS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [LCV20223274901] | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | REPLY BRIEF submitted by PARKER, DANA, BETH of K&L GATES LLP on behalf of WATCHTOWER BIBLE AND TRACT SOCIETY OF NEW YORK, HACKENSACK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES against CORINNE PANDELO *LINKED FILING* | |
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY submitted by KORGUL, MARGARET, T of MARKORLAW LLC on behalf of FAIRLAWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES against CORINNE PANDELO | |
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 09/15/2022 will be decided on 10/07/2022. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY [LCV20223335318] | |
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: OPPOSITION TO MOTION [LCV20223315131] -Please provide a courtesy copy of Plaintiff Corinne Pandelo's Opposition to chambers as soon as possible. Please note we are in courtroom 331. Thank you! | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by KESSLER, RAYNA, ELIZABETH of ROBINS KAPLAN LLP on behalf of CORINNE PANDELO against THE GOVERNING BODY OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, FAIRLAWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, WATCHTOWER BIBLE AND TRACT SOCIETY OF NEW YORK, HACKENSACK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-100 *LINKED FILING* | |
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [LCV20222677645] -Please provide a courtesy copy of the pending motion to chambers as soon as possible. Please note we are in courtroom 331. Thank you. | |
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event | CROSS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT submitted by KORGUL, MARGARET, T of MARKORLAW LLC on behalf of FAIRLAWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES against CORINNE PANDELO *LINKED FILING* | |
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 09/09/2022 will be decided on 09/23/2022. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: CROSS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [LCV20223274901] | |
August 26, 2022 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Judge: GREGG A PADOVANO |
||
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 07/20/2022 was rescheduled to 09/23/2022. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [LCV20222677645] | |
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [LCV20222677645] -The court has received and reviewed correspondence regarding the adjournment request. The court has adjourned the pending motion to September 23, 2022. Opposition and reply papers shall be filed in accordance with the timelines of the rules of court. | |
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE submitted by PARKER, DANA, BETH of K&L GATES LLP on behalf of WATCHTOWER BIBLE AND TRACT SOCIETY OF NEW YORK, HACKENSACK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES against CORINNE PANDELO *LINKED FILING* | |
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event | ADJOURNMENT REQUEST (MOTION) submitted by KESSLER, RAYNA, ELIZABETH of ROBINS KAPLAN LLP on behalf of CORINNE PANDELO against THE GOVERNING BODY OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, FAIRLAWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, WATCHTOWER BIBLE AND TRACT SOCIETY OF NEW YORK, HACKENSACK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-100 *LINKED FILING* | |
July 22, 2022 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by KESSLER, RAYNA, ELIZABETH of ROBINS KAPLAN LLP on behalf of CORINNE PANDELO against THE GOVERNING BODY OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, FAIRLAWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, WATCHTOWER BIBLE AND TRACT SOCIETY OF NEW YORK, HACKENSACK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-100 | |
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 07/20/2022 will be decided on 08/26/2022. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [LCV20222677645] | |
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT submitted by PARKER, DANA, BETH of K&L GATES LLP on behalf of WATCHTOWER BIBLE AND TRACT SOCIETY OF NEW YORK, HACKENSACK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES against CORINNE PANDELO *LINKED FILING* | |
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: Answer w/Jury Demand [LCV20222433434] -Filing fee of $250 was charged to account because Answer is seeking allocation. | |
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer W/Jury Demand submitted by KORGUL, MARGARET, T of MARKORLAW LLC on behalf of FAIRLAWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES against CORINNE PANDELO | |
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event | CONSENT ORDER - Granted by Judge PADOVANO, GREGG, A re: CONSENT ORDER [LCV20222200209] | |
June 20, 2022 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event | CONSENT ORDER submitted by KORGUL, MARGARET, T of MARKORLAW LLC on behalf of FAIRLAWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES against CORINNE PANDELO | |
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION submitted by KESSLER, RAYNA, ELIZABETH of ROBINS KAPLAN LLP on behalf of CORINNE PANDELO against FAIRLAWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, THE GOVERNING BODY OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-100, HACKENSACK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, WATCHTOWER BIBLE AND TRACT SOCIETY OF NEW YORK | |
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT-Granted by Judge DE LA CRUZ, ESTELA, M re: MOTION DISMISSING COMPLAINT [LCV2022229860] | |
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Default has been entered against the following party/parties: FAIRLAWN CONGREGATIO N OF JEHO V | |
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT submitted by KESSLER, RAYNA, ELIZABETH of ROBINS KAPLAN LLP on behalf of CORINNE PANDELO against FAIRLAWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, THE GOVERNING BODY OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-100, HACKENSACK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, WATCHTOWER BIBLE AND TRACT SOCIETY OF NEW YORK | |
May 07, 2022 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management | |
April 14, 2022 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION DISMISSING COMPLAINT
Judge: ESTELA M DE LA CRUZ |
||
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by KESSLER, RAYNA, ELIZABETH of ROBINS KAPLAN LLP on behalf of CORINNE PANDELO against FAIRLAWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, THE GOVERNING BODY OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-100, HACKENSACK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, WATCHTOWER BIBLE AND TRACT SOCIETY OF NEW YORK | |
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Order For Discovery - GRANTED by Judge DE LA CRUZ, ESTELA, M | |
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | ADJOURNMENT REQUEST (MOTION) submitted by SMITH, GARY, NEAL of SCHNADER HARRISON SEGAL & LEWIS, LLP on behalf of THE GOVERNING BODY OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES against CORINNE PANDELO, FAIRLAWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-100, HACKENSACK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, WATCHTOWER BIBLE AND TRACT SOCIETY OF NEW YORK *LINKED FILING* | |
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: MOTION DISMISSING COMPLAINT [LCV2022229860] -Per the 3/25/22 adjournment request, oral argument is rescheduled for Thursday, April 14, 2022 at 10 AM. Please advise chambers if a new conference call and dial in number will be used. | |
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 01/20/2022 was rescheduled to 04/14/2022. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION DISMISSING COMPLAINT [LCV2022229860] | |
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE-Granted by Judge DE LA CRUZ, ESTELA, M re: MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE [LCV2022870474] | |
March 18, 2022 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE
Judge: ESTELA M DE LA CRUZ |
||
March 18, 2022 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION DISMISSING COMPLAINT
Judge: ESTELA M DE LA CRUZ |
||
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event | REPLY BRIEF submitted by HUNTER, RAYMOND, J of SCHNADER HARRISON SEGAL & LEWIS, LLP on behalf of THE GOVERNING BODY OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES against CORINNE PANDELO, FAIRLAWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-100, HACKENSACK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, WATCHTOWER BIBLE AND TRACT SOCIETY OF NEW YORK *LINKED FILING* | |
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE [LCV2022932477] -Per Judge DeLaCruz, we have removed the administrative dismissal for this party and aborted it 90 days. | |
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: MOTION DISMISSING COMPLAINT [LCV2022229860] -Oral argument is rescheduled for Tuesday, March 29, 2022 at 10 AM. Please submit a conference call and dial in number to alicia.castro@njcourts.gov and alexandra.tran@njcourts.gov by no later than Monday, March 21, 2022. | |
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | ADJOURNMENT REQUEST submitted by SCHAERF, CARL, JUDAH of SCHNADER HARRISON SEGAL & LEWIS, LLP on behalf of THE GOVERNING BODY OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES against CORINNE PANDELO | |
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by KESSLER, RAYNA, ELIZABETH of ROBINS KAPLAN LLP on behalf of CORINNE PANDELO against FAIRLAWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, THE GOVERNING BODY OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-100, HACKENSACK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, WATCHTOWER BIBLE AND TRACT SOCIETY OF NEW YORK | |
March 05, 2022 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL ORDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
March 04, 2022 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION DISMISSING COMPLAINT
Judge: ESTELA M DE LA CRUZ |
||
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (NOT THE FIRST PAPER) submitted by KAMPFE, VERONICA, R of K&L GATES LLP on behalf of HACKENSACK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, WATCHTOWER BIBLE AND TRACT SOCIETY OF NEW YORK against CORINNE PANDELO | |
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: MOTION DISMISSING COMPLAINT [LCV2022229860] -Oral argument is scheduled for Friday, March 18, 2022 at 10 AM. Please submit a conference call and dial in number to alicia.castro@njcourts.gov and alexandra.tran@njcourts.gov by no later than Monday, March 14, 2022. | |
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE submitted by KESSLER, RAYNA, ELIZABETH of ROBINS KAPLAN LLP on behalf of CORINNE PANDELO against FAIRLAWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, THE GOVERNING BODY OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-100, HACKENSACK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, WATCHTOWER BIBLE AND TRACT SOCIETY OF NEW YORK | |
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 03/02/2022 will be decided on 03/18/2022. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE [LCV2022870474] | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 01/20/2022 was rescheduled to 03/18/2022. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION DISMISSING COMPLAINT [LCV2022229860] | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 01/20/2022 was rescheduled to 03/18/2022. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION DISMISSING COMPLAINT [LCV2022229860] | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 01/20/2022 was rescheduled to 03/04/2022. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION DISMISSING COMPLAINT [LCV2022229860] | |
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event | ADJOURNMENT REQUEST (MOTION) submitted by SCHAERF, CARL, JUDAH of SCHNADER HARRISON SEGAL & LEWIS, LLP on behalf of THE GOVERNING BODY OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES against CORINNE PANDELO *LINKED FILING* | |
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by KESSLER, RAYNA, ELIZABETH of ROBINS KAPLAN LLP on behalf of CORINNE PANDELO against FAIRLAWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, THE GOVERNING BODY OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-100, HACKENSACK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, WATCHTOWER BIBLE AND TRACT SOCIETY OF NEW YORK *LINKED FILING* | |
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE-Denied by Judge DE LA CRUZ, ESTELA, M re: MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE [LCV2022475880] | |
February 18, 2022 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE
Judge: ESTELA M DE LA CRUZ |
||
February 18, 2022 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION DISMISSING COMPLAINT
Judge: ESTELA M DE LA CRUZ |
||
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS-Partial by Judge DE LA CRUZ, ESTELA, M re: MOTION TO PRODUCE RECORDS [LCV2022222431] | |
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 01/20/2022 was rescheduled to 03/04/2022. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION DISMISSING COMPLAINT [LCV2022229860] | |
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by KESSLER, RAYNA, ELIZABETH of ROBINS KAPLAN LLP on behalf of CORINNE PANDELO against FAIRLAWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, THE GOVERNING BODY OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-100, HACKENSACK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, WATCHTOWER BIBLE AND TRACT SOCIETY OF NEW YORK | |
February 04, 2022 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION DISMISSING COMPLAINT
Judge: ESTELA M DE LA CRUZ |
||
February 04, 2022 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO PRODUCE RECORDS
Judge: ESTELA M DE LA CRUZ |
||
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 02/02/2022 will be decided on 02/18/2022. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE [LCV2022475880] | |
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT submitted by ZELANTE, THOMAS, A of K&L GATES LLP on behalf of WATCHTOWER BIBLE AND TRACT SOCIETY OF NEW YORK against CORINNE PANDELO, FAIRLAWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, THE GOVERNING BODY OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-100, HACKENSACK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES | |
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (NOT THE FIRST PAPER) submitted by YAMMINE, REYMOND, E of K&L GATES LLP on behalf of HACKENSACK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, WATCHTOWER BIBLE AND TRACT SOCIETY OF NEW YORK against CORINNE PANDELO | |
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE submitted by KESSLER, RAYNA, ELIZABETH of ROBINS KAPLAN LLP on behalf of CORINNE PANDELO against FAIRLAWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, THE GOVERNING BODY OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-100, HACKENSACK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, WATCHTOWER BIBLE AND TRACT SOCIETY OF NEW YORK | |
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer W/Jury Demand submitted by ZELANTE, THOMAS, A of K&L GATES LLP on behalf of HACKENSACK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, WATCHTOWER BIBLE AND TRACT SOCIETY OF NEW YORK against CORINNE PANDELO, FAIRLAWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, THE GOVERNING BODY OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-100 | |
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: MOTION TO PRODUCE RECORDS [LCV2022222431] -Please send a tabbed and ecourts stamped courtesy copy of this motion to chambers by no later than Friday, January 28, 2022. Our Courtroom is located in Room 352. | |
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION DISMISSING COMPLAINT submitted by HUNTER, RAYMOND, J of SCHNADER HARRISON SEGAL & LEWIS, LLP on behalf of THE GOVERNING BODY OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES against CORINNE PANDELO, FAIRLAWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-100, HACKENSACK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, WATCHTOWER BIBLE AND TRACT SOCIETY OF NEW YORK *LINKED FILING* | |
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 01/20/2022 was rescheduled to 02/18/2022. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION DISMISSING COMPLAINT [LCV2022229860] | |
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 01/19/2022 will be decided on 02/04/2022. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO PRODUCE RECORDS [LCV2022222431] | |
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 01/20/2022 will be decided on 02/04/2022. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION DISMISSING COMPLAINT [LCV2022229860] | |
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO PRODUCE RECORDS submitted by ZELANTE, THOMAS, A of K&L GATES LLP on behalf of HACKENSACK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, WATCHTOWER BIBLE AND TRACT SOCIETY OF NEW YORK against CORINNE PANDELO, FAIRLAWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, THE GOVERNING BODY OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-100 | |
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by KESSLER, RAYNA, ELIZABETH of ROBINS KAPLAN LLP on behalf of CORINNE PANDELO against FAIRLAWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, THE GOVERNING BODY OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-100, HACKENSACK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, WATCHTOWER BIBLE AND TRACT SOCIETY OF NEW YORK | |
January 01, 2022 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event | STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR ANSWER submitted by ZELANTE, THOMAS, A of K&L GATES LLP on behalf of HACKENSACK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, WATCHTOWER BIBLE AND TRACT SOCIETY OF NEW YORK against CORINNE PANDELO, FAIRLAWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, THE GOVERNING BODY OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-100 | |
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer W/Jury Demand submitted by ZELANTE, THOMAS, A of K&L GATES LLP on behalf of WATCHTOWER BIBLE AND TRACT SOCIETY OF NEW YORK against CORINNE PANDELO, FAIRLAWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, THE GOVERNING BODY OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-100, HACKENSACK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES | |
November 11, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (NOT THE FIRST PAPER) submitted by ZELANTE, THOMAS, A of K&L GATES LLP on behalf of WATCHTOWER BIBLE AND TRACT SOCIETY OF NEW YORK against CORINNE PANDELO, FAIRLAWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, THE GOVERNING BODY OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-100, HACKENSACK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES | |
November 11, 2021 | Docket Event | STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR ANSWER submitted by ZELANTE, THOMAS, A of K&L GATES LLP on behalf of WATCHTOWER BIBLE AND TRACT SOCIETY OF NEW YORK against CORINNE PANDELO, FAIRLAWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, THE GOVERNING BODY OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-100, HACKENSACK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer submitted by ZELANTE, THOMAS, A of K&L GATES LLP on behalf of WATCHTOWER BIBLE AND TRACT SOCIETY OF NEW YORK against CORINNE PANDELO, FAIRLAWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, THE GOVERNING BODY OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-100, HACKENSACK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT submitted by KESSLER, RAYNA, ELIZABETH of ROBINS KAPLAN LLP on behalf of CORINNE PANDELO against FAIRLAWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, THE GOVERNING BODY OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-100, HACKENSACK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, WATCHTOWER BIBLE AND TRACT SOCIETY OF NEW YORK | |
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR ANSWER submitted by ZELANTE, THOMAS, A of K&L GATES LLP on behalf of WATCHTOWER BIBLE AND TRACT SOCIETY OF NEW YORK against CORINNE PANDELO, FAIRLAWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, THE GOVERNING BODY OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-100, HACKENSACK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAHS WITNESSES | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: Complaint [LCV20211914643] -Please be advised that ACMS has been updated to reflect DTC as indicated on the complaint. | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint with Jury Demand for BER-L-005508-21 submitted by KESSLER, RAYNA ELIZABETH, ROBINS KAPLAN LLP on behalf of CORINNE PANDELO against THE GOVERNING BODY OF JEHOVAHS, FAIRLAWN CONGREGATION OF JEHOV, WATCHTOWER BIBLE AND TRACT SOC, HACKENSACK CONGREGATION OF JEH, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-100 |