Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Petition of Nam Hoang Dinh
On February 20, 2020 a petitions - other case was filed by Dinh, Nam Hoang, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. Judge David I. Brown presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 20, 2020
Last Refreshed
March 12, 2022
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Parties
Plaintiffs
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Order to Show Cause - Petition for Change of Name - Civil Law and Motion heard on 06/18/2020 02:00:00 PM . |
|
June 18, 2020 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause - Petition for Change of Name - Civil Law and Motion Heard Judge: David I. Brown |
|
June 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Decree Changing Name filed. |
|
June 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Granted . | |
June 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition for Change of Name has been Granted . | |
June 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication filed. |
|
May 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 05/14/2020 02:00:00 PM . |
|
May 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Petition for Change of Name - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 06/18/2020 at 02:00:00 PM in Department 53 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: David I. Brown |
|
May 14, 2020 | hearing |
Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion Heard Judge: David I. Brown |
|
April 02, 2020 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause - Petition for Change of Name - Civil Law and Motion Scheduled Judge: David I. Brown |
|
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Petition for Change of Name - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 04/02/2020 at 02:00:00 PM in Department 53 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: David I. Brown |
|
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Dinh, Nam Hoang Application for Waiver granted in part on 02/24/2020. | |
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed. |
|
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause re Change of Name filed. |
|
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition for Change of Name filed. |
|
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 53 .
Judge: David I. Brown |
|
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. |
|
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Decree filed. |
|