Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Charise Lee Alberti vs. Elena Maurine Becker
On July 29, 2019 a harassment case was filed by Alberti, Charise Lee, against Becker, Elena Maurine, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. Judge David De Alba presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 29, 2019
Last Refreshed
December 02, 2021
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
David De Alba;Category
Civil - Unlimited
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Harassment
Status
Dismissal
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 29, 2020 | hearing |
Hearing Re: Permanent Restraining Order - Civil Harassment Scheduled Judge: David De Alba |
|
May 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders has been Dismissed . | |
May 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order 5/29/20 |
|
May 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Dismissed . | |
May 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing Re: Permanent Restraining Order - Civil Harassment scheduled for 05/29/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 41 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: David De Alba |
|
May 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Telephone Appearance Permanent Hearing (Civil Harassment) |
|
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Hearing Re: Permanent Restraining Order - Civil Harassment scheduled for 05/15/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 1 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse . | |
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order 02/21/2020 |
|
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Hearing Re: Permanent Restraining Order - Civil Harassment scheduled for 02/21/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 1 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse . | |
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order 11-15-19 |
|
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Hearing Re: Permanent Restraining Order - Civil Harassment scheduled for 11/15/2019 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 1 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse . | |
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order 10-18-19 |
|
September 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Hearing Re: Permanent Restraining Order - Civil Harassment scheduled for 10/18/2019 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 1 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse . | |
September 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order 09/20/19 |
|
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Hearing Re: Permanent Restraining Order - Civil Harassment scheduled for 09/20/2019 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 1 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse . | |
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order 08/23/19 |
|
August 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed. |
|
July 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing and Temporary Restraining Order filed. |
|
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed. |
|
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Hearing Re: Permanent Restraining Order - Civil Harassment scheduled for 08/23/2019 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 1 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse . | |
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. |
|