Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
TD Bank USA NA as Successor vs. Selina Gonzales
On August 12, 2019 rule 3.740 collections case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 12, 2019
Last Refreshed
March 12, 2022
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Case Duration
3 months and 20 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration of Non Service filed. |
|
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 08/15/2019 . | |
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Statement of Venue filed. |
|
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint filed. |
|
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. |
|
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons filed. |
|