Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Portfolio Recovery Assistance, LLC vs. Benjamin McKenzie
On April 30, 2019 rule 3.740 collections case was filed by Portfolio Recovery Assistance, Llc, represented by Michael S Hunt, against Mckenzie, Benjamin, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 30, 2019
Last Refreshed
March 12, 2022
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Settlement
Case Duration
6 months and 15 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice - Other (of Intention To Request Entry Of Judgment Under Stipulation) filed. |
|
August 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint - (B&P 6322.1(c)) disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal . | |
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Stipulation filed. |
|
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal filed. |
|
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Conditional Settlement filed. |
|
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal . | |
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal . | |
May 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. |
|
May 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 05/02/2019 . | |
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint - (B&P 6322.1(c)) filed. |
|
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other filed. |
|
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. |
|
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons filed. |
|