Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Midland Funding LLC vs. Tina L Tang
On August 27, 2018 rule 3.740 collections case was filed by Midland Funding Llc, represented by Michael S Hunt, against Tang, Tina L., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 27, 2018
Last Refreshed
March 12, 2022
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Default Judgment
Case Duration
9 months and 22 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal . | |
June 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal filed. |
|
June 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal . | |
June 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal . | |
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Request - Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed. |
|
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (In Support of Application for Entry of Default Judgment Pursuant to CIV.CODE SEC 1788.60(b)) filed. |
|
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Tang, Tina L on Complaint . | |
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (CCP 1033 and Attorney Fees) filed. |
|
October 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. |
|
August 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 08/30/2018 . | |
August 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint filed. |
|
August 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. |
|
August 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons filed. |
|