Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC vs. Charlene Herrera
On August 27, 2018 rule 3.740 collections case was filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, represented by Keri L Salet, against Herrera, Charlene, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 27, 2018
Last Refreshed
March 11, 2022
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Default Judgment
Case Duration
1 year, 3 months and 6 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Returned Document - Default Judgment by Court Rejected filed. |
|
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Herrera, Charlene on Complaint - (B&P 6322.1(c)) . | |
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (CCP 1033) filed. |
|
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Request - Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed. |
|
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (In Support of Application for Entry of Default Judgment Pursuant to CIV.CODE SEC 1788.60(b)) filed. |
|
September 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. |
|
August 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 08/30/2018 . | |
August 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Statement of Venue filed. |
|
August 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint - (B&P 6322.1(c)) filed. |
|
August 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. |
|
August 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons filed. |
|