Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Barbara Bernard-Fultcher vs. Icarz Inc
On August 13, 2018 a contract - other case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 13, 2018
Last Refreshed
May 13, 2022
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Category
Civil - Unlimited
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Status
Settlement
Case Duration
6 months and 29 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal . | |
March 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal filed. |
|
March 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal . | |
March 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal . | |
February 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 02/14/2019 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 23 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated . | |
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Conditional Settlement filed. |
|
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/14/2019 08:30:00 AM published . |
|
February 07, 2019 | Tentative Ruling | No appearance is required under the following conditions: This case is referred to Trial Setting Process for selection of Trial and Mandatory Settlement Conference dates. All counsel (including partie...
Judge: Kevin R. Culhane |
|
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement filed. |
|
January 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement filed. |
|
October 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Hopkins, Ronald W added as a effective 10/05/2018 . | |
October 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Answer filed. |
|
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. |
|
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. |
|
August 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Statement of Damages submitted by Bernard-Fultcher, Barbara rejected on 08/14/2018 . |
|
August 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 08/14/2018 . | |
August 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 02/14/2019 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 23 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated . |
|
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint filed. |
|
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Statement of Venue filed. |
|
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons filed. |
|
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. |
|
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 23 . |