Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Anita Singh vs. Toney McDonald
On September 30, 2016 a harassment case was filed by Singh, Anita, against Mcdonald, Toney, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 30, 2016
Last Refreshed
October 22, 2021
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Category
Civil - Unlimited
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Harassment
Case Duration
1 month and 10 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 10, 2016 | hearing |
Hearing Re: Permanent Restraining Order - Civil Harassment Scheduled |
|
November 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order after hearing |
|
November 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Restraining Order After Hearing To Stop Harassment (Permanent Order) filed. |
|
November 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders has been Granted . | |
November 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Granted . | |
November 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed. |
|
November 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Hearing Re: Permanent Restraining Order - Civil Harassment scheduled for 11/10/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 1 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse . | |
November 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed. |
|
October 21, 2016 | Docket Event | minute order after hearing |
|
October 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. |
|
September 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed. |
|
September 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing and Temporary Restraining Order filed. |
|
September 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Hearing Re: Permanent Restraining Order - Civil Harassment scheduled for 10/21/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 1 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse . | |
September 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. |
|