Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Patrick Barragan vs. Ford Motor Company
On October 26, 2016 a breach of contract/warranty case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. Judge David De Alba presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 26, 2016
Last Refreshed
May 14, 2022
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Category
Civil - Unlimited
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Status
Transfer
Case Duration
11 months and 22 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Calfo, Alexander G added as a effective 09/25/2017 . | |
September 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney filed. |
|
May 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Receipt for Certified Mail and Transfer of Documents |
|
April 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement filed. |
|
April 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 04/27/2017 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 30 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .
Judge: David De Alba |
|
April 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Certification Cover Sheet ¿ Change of Venue - Transfer out to Placer County Superior Court |
|
April 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Transmittal of Papers and Pleadings - Change of Venue - Transfer out to Placer County Superior Court |
|
April 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Certified Mail Receipt - Change of Venue - Transfer out to Placer County Superior Court |
|
April 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Order After Hearing (re: Defendant D.O. Neronde, Inc., DBA Auburn Ford's Mot for Mandatory Transfer of Venue) filed. |
|
January 31, 2017 | hearing |
Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion Heard |
|
January 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion heard on 01/31/2017 09:30:00 AM . |
|
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion set on 01/31/2017 09:30:00 AM published . |
|
January 30, 2017 | Tentative Ruling | Defendant D.O. Neronde, Inc. dba Auburn Fords (Auburn Ford) motion to transfer venue to Placer County is GRANTED. Plaintiffs Patrick Barragan and Joanne Barragans (Plaintiffs) shall pay transfer...
Judge: Steve White |
|
January 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Non-Opposition filed. |
|
January 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Reply (In Support of motion) filed. |
|
January 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Of J.Cheng) filed. |
|
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Opposition (Pltf's Opp to Deft's Mtn for Transfer of Venue) filed. |
|
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (of Jared Walder in Support of Pltf's Opp to Deft's Mtn for Transfer of Venue) filed. |
|
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice - Other (Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear) filed. |
|
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Joinder in Motion filed. |
|
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Deft D.O. Neronde Inc DBA Auburn Ford's Memo of P&A In Support of Motion for Mandatory Transfer of Venue) filed. |
|
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Motion (Mandatory Transfer of Venue) filed. |
|
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Proposed Order filed. |
|
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (of Jamie M. Cheng In Support of Deft D.O. Neronde, Inc DBA Auburn Ford's Motion for Mandatory Transfer of Venue) filed. |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated . |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for heard on 12/21/2016 03:44:00 PM . |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion scheduled for 01/31/2017 at 09:30:00 AM in Department 47 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse . | |
December 16, 2016 | hearing |
Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion Heard Judge: David I. Brown |
|
December 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 12/16/2016 04:00:00 PM . |
|
December 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Motion to Strike) filed. |
|
December 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion to Strike (Portions of Complaint) filed. |
|
December 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 01/31/2017 at 02:00:00 PM in Department 53 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: David I. Brown |
|
December 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Efstratis, H. Paul added as a effective 12/16/2016 . | |
December 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Declaration of Prejudice CCP 170.6 filed. |
|
December 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. |
|
November 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. |
|
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 04/27/2017 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 30 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .
Judge: David De Alba |
|
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 10/27/2016 . | |
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Complaint filed. |
|
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 30 .
Judge: David De Alba |
|
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. |
|
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Summons filed. |
|