Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC vs. Hai Van Nguyen
On July 19, 2013 rule 3.740 collections case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. Judge David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 19, 2013
Last Refreshed
March 12, 2022
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Default Judgment
Case Duration
4 years, 4 months and 13 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued |
|
December 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Complaint disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk . | |
November 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does filed. |
|
November 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk . | |
November 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Judgment entered . | |
November 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Nguyen, Hai Van on Complaint . | |
November 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Waiver of Attorney Fees) filed. |
|
November 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed. |
|
November 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed. |
|
November 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Pham, Thoa Thi on Complaint . | |
September 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. |
|
August 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. |
|
August 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Summons filed. |
|
August 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 08/07/2013 . | |
July 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Complaint filed. |
|
July 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Statement of Venue filed. |
|
July 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 39 .
Judge: David W. Abbott |
|
July 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. |
|