Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC vs. Cheryl Bode
On July 19, 2013 rule 3.740 collections case was filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, represented by Anita H Singh, against Bode, Cheryl, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. Judge David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 19, 2013
Last Refreshed
March 11, 2022
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Case Duration
5 months and 20 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal . | |
January 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal . | |
December 23, 2013 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed. |
|
December 23, 2013 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal . | |
August 28, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration of Non Service filed. |
|
August 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Summons filed. |
|
August 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 08/07/2013 . | |
July 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Complaint filed. |
|
July 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 39 .
Judge: David W. Abbott |
|
July 19, 2013 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. |
|