Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
State of California, Employment Development Department vs. Lagman, Roy A.
On November 01, 2011 an other employment case was filed by State Of California, Employment Development Department, represented by State Of California, Employment Development Department, against Lagman, Roy A., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 01, 2011
Last Refreshed
March 12, 2022
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Labor and Employment
Matter Type
General Employment
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Duration
1 year, 7 months and 24 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed. |
|
June 21, 2013 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed. |
|
June 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed. |
|
November 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment . | |
November 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) <=$10k filed. |
|
November 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Judgment entered . | |
November 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment . |