Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
State of California, Employment Development Department vs. Gertrudes B Herra
On November 01, 2011 an other employment case was filed by State Of California, Employment Development Department, represented by State Of California, Employment Development Department, against Herra, Gertrudes B., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 01, 2011
Last Refreshed
March 12, 2022
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Labor and Employment
Matter Type
General Employment
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
6 years, 7 months and 14 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) $10k<=$25k disposed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal . | |
June 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Case reopened . | |
June 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Disposition for Herra, Gertrudes on Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) $10k<=$25k vacated . | |
June 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Disposition for State of California, Employment Development Department on Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) $10k<=$25k vacated . | |
May 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Application to Vacate EDD Judgment' filed. |
|
May 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal . | |
May 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal . | |
January 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) $10k<=$25k disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment . | |
November 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment Issued |
|
November 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Certificate for Summary Judgment, Summary Judgment, and Notice of Entry of Judgment (Employment Development Department State Judgment) $10k<=$25k filed. |
|
November 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. |
|
November 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Judgment entered . | |
November 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of EDD state judgment . | |
November 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Abstract issued . |