Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Midland Funding LLC vs. Annette Jackson
On December 28, 2011 rule 3.740 collections case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. Judge Gerrit W. Wood presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 28, 2011
Last Refreshed
March 11, 2022
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Default Judgment
Case Duration
6 months and 18 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 16, 2012 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment Issued |
|
May 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Complaint disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk . | |
May 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does filed. |
|
May 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Judgment entered . | |
May 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed. |
|
May 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other filed. |
|
May 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (CCP 1033) filed. |
|
May 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk . | |
May 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Jackson, Annette on Complaint . | |
May 07, 2012 | Docket Event | Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed. |
|
January 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. |
|
January 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 01/09/2012 . | |
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Complaint filed. |
|
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 36 .
Judge: Gerrit W. Wood |
|
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Declaration Of Venue) filed. |
|
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Summons filed. |
|
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. |
|