Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Cavalry SPV I LLC Assignee vs. Cindy A Webb
On November 28, 2011 rule 3.740 collections case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. Judge Alan G. Perkins presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 28, 2011
Last Refreshed
March 11, 2022
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Default Judgment
Case Duration
7 years and 4 months
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued |
|
March 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed. |
|
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued |
|
February 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed. |
|
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed. |
|
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued |
|
March 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed. |
|
September 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does filed. |
|
September 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment - by Court - Default filed. |
|
September 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Complaint disposed with disposition of Default judgment by court . | |
September 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment entered . | |
September 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by court . | |
February 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Affidavit - Other (of Sale) filed. |
|
February 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Request - Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed. |
|
November 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Returned Document - Default Judgment by Court Rejected filed. |
|
June 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Request - Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed. |
|
June 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Affidavit of Sale and Certification of Debt) filed. |
|
May 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Returned Document - Default Judgment by Court Rejected filed. |
|
November 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (CCP 585d) filed. |
|
November 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Webb, Cindy A on Complaint . | |
November 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (RE Original Documents) filed. |
|
November 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (RE Waiver of Amount Prayed for in Complaint) filed. |
|
November 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Request - Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed. |
|
January 03, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. |
|
December 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 12/01/2011 . | |
November 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Complaint filed. |
|
November 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Statement of Venue filed. |
|
November 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 35 .
Judge: Alan G. Perkins |
|
November 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. |
|
November 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Summons filed. |
|