Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Midland Funding LLC vs. Erlinda Swanegan
On September 20, 2011 rule 3.740 collections case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. Judge David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 20, 2011
Last Refreshed
March 11, 2022
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Default Judgment
Case Duration
5 months and 22 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2012 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment Issued |
|
November 15, 2011 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does filed. |
|
November 15, 2011 | Docket Event | Application - Other (For Interest Cost And Attorney Fees) filed. |
|
November 15, 2011 | Docket Event | Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed. |
|
November 15, 2011 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (RE Calculation Of Interest & Waiver Of Attorney Fee) filed. |
|
November 15, 2011 | Docket Event | Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed. |
|
November 15, 2011 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Pursuant To CCP 1033 (b) (2)) filed. |
|
November 15, 2011 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Swanegan, Erlinda on Complaint . | |
November 15, 2011 | Docket Event | Judgment entered . | |
November 15, 2011 | Docket Event | Complaint disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk . | |
November 15, 2011 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk . | |
October 12, 2011 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. |
|
September 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Complaint filed. |
|
September 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 39 .
Judge: David W. Abbott |
|
September 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 09/20/2011 . | |
September 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other filed. |
|
September 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Summons filed. |
|
September 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. |
|