Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
HSBC Bank Nevada NA vs. Antonio J Echevarry
On November 03, 2010 rule 3.740 collections case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. Judge David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 03, 2010
Last Refreshed
March 12, 2022
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Default Judgment
Case Duration
4 years, 2 months and 28 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed. |
|
September 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed. |
|
September 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued |
|
September 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed. |
|
February 01, 2012 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution (Alameda) Issued |
|
September 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment Issued |
|
August 29, 2011 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment submitted by HSBC Bank Nevada NA rejected on 08/29/2011 . |
|
July 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Complaint disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk . | |
March 09, 2011 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does filed. |
|
March 09, 2011 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Supporting a Clerk Judgment) filed. |
|
March 09, 2011 | Docket Event | Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed. |
|
March 09, 2011 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Supporting Clerk entry of Statutory Attorney fees) filed. |
|
March 09, 2011 | Docket Event | Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed. |
|
March 09, 2011 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk . | |
March 09, 2011 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Echevarry, Antonio J on Complaint . | |
March 09, 2011 | Docket Event | Judgment entered . | |
March 09, 2011 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other ((CCP585(a)(d))) filed. |
|
November 23, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. |
|
November 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 11/10/2010 . | |
November 03, 2010 | Docket Event | Complaint filed. |
|
November 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 39 .
Judge: David W. Abbott |
|
November 03, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons filed. |
|
November 03, 2010 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. |
|
November 03, 2010 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other filed. |
|