Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
HSBC Bank Nevada N A vs. Deborah Worster
On August 19, 2010 rule 3.740 collections case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. Judge David I. Brown presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 19, 2010
Last Refreshed
March 11, 2022
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Judy Holzer Hersher;Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Default Judgment
Case Duration
5 years, 11 months and 24 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed. |
|
April 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed. |
|
April 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued |
|
September 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed. |
|
June 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice - Other (of pltf's request to take mtn off calendar) filed. |
|
June 26, 2012 | hearing |
Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption - Civil Law and Motion Heard Judge: David I. Brown |
|
June 26, 2012 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption - Civil Law and Motion heard on 06/26/2012 02:00:00 PM . |
|
June 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice - Other (Notice of Plaintiff's request to take Motion off Calendar and Decleartion Proof of Service) submitted by HSBC Bank Nevada N A rejected on 06/20/2012 . |
|
June 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 06/26/2012 at 02:00:00 PM in Department 53 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .
Judge: David I. Brown |
|
May 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption filed. |
|
May 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption filed. |
|
January 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued |
|
April 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Complaint disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk . | |
December 17, 2010 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does filed. |
|
December 17, 2010 | Docket Event | Judgment entered . | |
December 17, 2010 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Supplemental Declaration CCP 585d) filed. |
|
December 17, 2010 | Docket Event | Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed. |
|
December 17, 2010 | Docket Event | Request - Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed. |
|
December 17, 2010 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk . | |
December 17, 2010 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Worster, Deborah on Complaint. | |
September 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. |
|
August 24, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 08/24/2010 . | |
August 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Complaint filed. |
|
August 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 45 .
Judge: Judy Holzer Hersher |
|
August 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. |
|
August 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons filed. |
|
August 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Affidavit Of Venue) filed. |
|