Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
HSBC Bank Nevada NA vs. Carolyn J Riddle
On August 16, 2010 rule 3.740 collections case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. Judge David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 16, 2010
Last Refreshed
March 11, 2022
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Category
Civil - Limited
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Case Duration
1 year, 7 months and 20 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2012 | Docket Event | Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal . | |
April 06, 2012 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal . | |
March 26, 2012 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed. |
|
March 26, 2012 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal . | |
September 07, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. |
|
August 18, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 08/18/2010 . | |
August 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Complaint filed. |
|
August 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 39 .
Judge: David W. Abbott |
|
August 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. |
|
August 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons filed. |
|
August 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other filed. |
|